This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32007E0120
Council Common Position 2007/120/CFSP of 19 February 2007 renewing restrictive measures against Zimbabwe
Council Common Position 2007/120/CFSP of 19 February 2007 renewing restrictive measures against Zimbabwe
Council Common Position 2007/120/CFSP of 19 February 2007 renewing restrictive measures against Zimbabwe
SL L 51, 20.2.2007, p. 25–30
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
SL L 4M, 8.1.2008, p. 109–114
(MT)
No longer in force, Date of end of validity: 20/02/2008
Relation | Act | Comment | Subdivision concerned | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Modifies | 32004E0161 | Zamjena | prilog | 19/02/2007 | |
Extended validity | 32004E0161 | 20/02/2008 |
20.2.2007 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
L 51/25 |
COUNCIL COMMON POSITION 2007/120/CFSP
of 19 February 2007
renewing restrictive measures against Zimbabwe
THE COUNCIL OF THE EUROPEAN UNION,
Having regard to the Treaty on European Union, and in particular Article 15 thereof,
Whereas:
(1) |
On 19 February 2004, the Council adopted Common Position 2004/161/CFSP renewing restrictive measures against Zimbabwe (1). These measures expire on 20 February 2007. |
(2) |
In view of the situation in Zimbabwe, Common Position 2004/161/CFSP should be extended for a further period of 12 months. |
(3) |
The list of persons subject to the restrictive measures should be updated, |
HAS ADOPTED THIS COMMON POSITION:
Article 1
Common Position 2004/161/CFSP is hereby extended until 20 February 2008.
Article 2
The Annex to Common Position 2004/161/CFSP shall be replaced by the text appearing in the Annex to this Common Position.
Article 3
This Common Position shall take effect on the date of its adoption.
Article 4
This Common Position shall be published in the Official Journal of the European Union.
Done at Brussels, 19 February 2007.
For the Council
The President
M. GLOS
(1) OJ L 50, 20.2.2004, p. 66. Common Position as last amended by Common Position 2006/51/CFSP (OJ L 26, 31.1.2006, p. 28).
ANNEX
List of persons referred to in Article 4 and 5 of Common Position 2004/161/CFSP
|
President, born 21.2.1924 |
||
|
Director-General Central Intelligence Organisation, born 6.11.1960 |
||
|
Minister for Special Affairs responsible for Land and Resettlement Programmes (Former Minister of State in the Vice-President's Office and former Minister of State for the Land Reform Programme in the President's Office), born 25.2.1968 |
||
|
Assistant Police Commissioner, Police Spokesman |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Finance (former Deputy Minister of Finance and Economic Development), born 7.4.1957 |
||
|
Permanent Secretary, Department for Information and Publicity, born 4.4.1963 |
||
|
Former Deputy Minister for Local Government, Public Works and National Housing, born 10.6.1962 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Manicaland |
||
|
Minister of Education, Sports and Culture, born 25.11.1939 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Industry and International Trade |
||
|
Police Commissioner, born 10.3.1953 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Committee Member |
||
|
Minister of State for Public and Interactive Affairs (former Minister of Post and Telecommunications), born 28.8.1943 |
||
|
Minister of Justice, Legal and Parliamentary Affairs, born 25.1.1947 |
||
|
Former Minister of Mines and Mining Development, born 14.3.1955 |
||
|
Former Deputy Minister of Home Affairs, born 10.10.1946 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Committee Member, born 27.3.1928 |
||
|
Commander Zimbabwe Defence Forces, General (former Army Commander, Lieutenant General), born 25.8.1956 |
||
|
Chairman, ZEC (Supreme Court Judge and Chairman of the controversial delimitation committee), born 4.6.1953 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Masvingo (former Senior Secretary responsible for Special Affairs in the President's Office), born 19.3.1949 |
||
|
Minister of Local Government, Public Works and Urban Development, born 1.8.1952 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Senior Committee Member, born 1939 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Women's Affairs Gender and Community Development |
||
|
Minister of Public Service, Labour and Social Welfare (former Minister of State for National Security in the President's Office), born 1.8.1946 |
||
|
Chairman, Electoral Supervisory Commission |
||
|
Former Chairman of Electoral Supervisory Commission |
||
|
Minister of Economic Development (former Minister of State for State Enterprises and Parastatals in the President's Office, born 8.3.1940 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Secretary for Economic Affairs, born 1935 |
||
|
Former Provincial Governor: Masvingo, born 7.11.1935 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Committee Member, born 17.2.1938 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Harare and ZANU (PF) Politburo Secretary for Finance, born 25.5.1947 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Youth Development & Employment Creation and ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy-Secretary for Youth Affairs, born 23.10.1970 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Mashonaland East, born 4.3.1963 |
||
|
Former Minister of Finance and Economic Development, born 4.4.1949. NB currently in remand |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Environment and Tourism and former Deputy Minister of Transport and Communications |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Committee Member, born 1933 |
||
|
Former Deputy Minister of Mines and Mining Development, born 13.6.1952 |
||
|
Minister of Agriculture and Rural Development (former Minister of Lands, Agricultural and Rural Resettlement), born 21.11.1954 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) President of Senate, born 11.7.1943 |
||
|
Former Deputy Minister for Youth Development, Gender and Employment Creation, born 4.4.1941 |
||
|
Chair, Media Information Commission |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary General for Economic Affairs (former Minister of Finance), born 22.3.1950 |
||
|
Acting Mayor of Harare (ZANU-PF) |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Disabled and Disadvantaged, born 28.4.1944 |
||
|
Minister of State (former Minister of Public Service, Labour and Social Welfare), born 10.8.1961 |
||
|
Minister without Portfolio (former Minister of Youth Development, Gender and Employment Creation), born 30.07.1955 |
||
|
Former Deputy Minister of Industry and International Trade, born 10.8.1934 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Home Affairs (former Deputy Minister of Energy and Power Development), born 4.4.1948 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Mashonaland Central |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Matabeleland South (ZANU (PF) Politburo, Secretary for Disabled and Disadvantaged), born 14.10.1936 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Bulawayo |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Matabeleland North and ZANU (PF) Politburo, Deputy Secretary for Transport and Social Welfare |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Rural Housing and Social Amenities, born 17.8.1960 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Information and Publicity, born 1969 |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Foreign Affairs |
||
|
Permanent Secretary, Ministry of Home Affairs |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Committee Member |
||
|
Permanent Secretary, Ministry of Local Government, Public Works and Urban Development |
||
|
Minister of Mines and Mining Development (former Minister of Energy and Power Development), born 4.7.1952 |
||
|
Minister of Rural Housing and Social Amenities (former Speaker of Parliament), born 15.9.1946 |
||
|
Minister of Home Affairs (former Deputy Minister of Local Government, Public Works and National Housing), born 15.11.1949 |
||
|
Former Minister of State for Information and Publicity in the President's Office, born 12.1.1957 |
||
|
Former Minister of Energy and Power Development (former Minister of Public Service, Labour and Social Welfare), born 7.5.1950 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Legal Affairs, born 1945. NB Ambassador to South Africa |
||
|
Minister for Industry and International Trade (former Provincial Governor: Matabeleland North) (ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for National Security), born 12.10.1951 |
||
|
Vice-President, born 6.12.1923 |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Midlands, born 7.7.1931 |
||
|
Minister of State for Science and Technology in the President's Office (former Minister of State in Vice-President Msika's Office), born 18.8.1946 |
||
|
Minister for Women's Affairs , Gender and Community Development ZANU (PF) Politburo Secretary for Gender and Culture, born 14.12.1958 |
||
|
Registrar General, born 22.12.1942 |
||
|
Minister of Higher Tertiary Education (former Minister of Foreign Affairs), born 17.12.1941 |
||
|
Spouse of Robert Gabriel Mugabe, born 23.7.1965 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Senior Committee Member, born 14.10.1934 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Health and Child Welfare, born 1965 |
||
|
Vice-President (former Minister of Water Resources and Infrastructural Development), born 15.4.1955 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Senior Committee Member, born 1.5.1949 |
||
|
Former Minister of Industry and International Trade, born 23.10.1942 |
||
|
Minister of Foreign Affairs, born 20.7.1945 |
||
|
Minister of Finance (former Minister of Higher and Tertiary Education), born 31.7.1941 |
||
|
Assistant Police Commissioner |
||
|
Minister of Transport and Communications (former Deputy Minister of Transport and Communications), born 6.2.1954 |
||
|
Minister of State for National Security, Land Reform and Resettlement in the Office of the President, ZANU (PF) Secretary for Administration, born 27.7.1935 |
||
|
Minister for Water Resources and Infrastructural Development |
||
|
Minister of Youth Development, Gender and Employment Creation, Retired Brigadier |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Small and Medium Enterprises Development and Employment Creation, born 27.5.1948 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Senior Committee Member, born 28.10.1922 |
||
|
Brigadier (former Director-General Central Intelligence Organisation), born 24.6.1957 |
||
|
Deputy Miniter of Public Service, Labour and Social Welfare (former Deputy Minister of Foreign Affairs), born 13.10.1954 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Secretary for Production and Labour, born 22.10.1930 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Commissariat, born 26.6.1942 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Commissariat, born 20.9.1949 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Agriculture, born 4.8.1955 |
||
|
Minister of Environment and Tourism, born 17.4.1959 |
||
|
Speaker of Parliament (former Minister of Special Affairs in the President's Office), born 22.8.1934 |
||
|
Minister for Energy and Power Development (former Lieutenant General, Provincial Governor: Manicaland), born 23.7.1955 |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Transport and Communications |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary of Science and Technology |
||
|
Minister of Small and Medium Enterprises Development and Employment Creation, born 20.9.1949 |
||
|
Minister of Health and Child Welfare (former Deputy Minister), born 2.8.1950 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Finance, born 28.10.1928 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Gender and Culture |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Mines and Mining Development (former Deputy Minister for Water Resources and Infrastructural Development), born 10.5.1945 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Local Government, Public Works and Urban Development |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Health and Child Welfare |
||
|
Provincial Governor: Mashonaland West |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Women's Affairs |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Deputy Secretary for Transport and Social Welfare, born 21.3.1968 |
||
|
Minister of Defence, born 30.3.1944 |
||
|
Chief Elections Officer |
||
|
Minister of State for Policy Implementation (former Minister of State for Policy Implementation in the President's Office), born 6.6.1945 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Secretary for Information and Publicity, born 29.9.1928 |
||
|
Air Marshal (Air Force), born 1.11.1955 |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Education, Sports and Culture, born 3.1.1949 |
||
|
Former Chair, National War Veterans Association, born 31.12.1970 |
||
|
Cabinet Secretary (successor to No. 121 Charles Utete), born 3.5.1949 |
||
|
Commander Zimbabwe National Army, Lieutenant General, born 25.8.1956 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Secretary for Youth Affairs |
||
|
Health Advisor in the Office of the President, born 15.10.1936 |
||
|
ZANU (PF) Politburo Deputy Secretary for Finance, born 15.6.1940 |
||
|
Deputy Minister of Economic Development |
||
|
Chairman of the Presidential Land Review Committee (former Cabinet Secretary), born 30.10.1938 |
||
|
Senior Assistant Police Commissioner, Officer Commanding Harare |
||
|
Prisons Director, born 4.3.1947 |
||
|
Deputy Minister for Science and Technology (NB Mugabe's nephew) |
||
|
Politburo, Indigenisation and Empowerment Committee in the party, born 27.9.1943 |