This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32013D0426(01)
Council Decision of 22 April 2013 appointing the members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work
Council Decision of 22 April 2013 appointing the members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work
Council Decision of 22 April 2013 appointing the members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work
IO C 120, 26.4.2013, p. 7–11
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
No longer in force, Date of end of validity: 28/02/2016
26.4.2013 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 120/7 |
COUNCIL DECISION
of 22 April 2013
appointing the members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work
2013/C 120/02
THE COUNCIL OF THE EUROPEAN UNION,
Having regard to the Treaty on the Functioning of the European Union,
Having regard to Council Decision 2003/C 218/01 of 22 July 2003 setting up an Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work (1), and in particular Article 3 thereof,
Having regard to the list of candidates submitted to the Council by the Governments of the Member States,
Whereas:
(1) |
By its Decision of 16 February 2010 (2), the Council appointed the members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work for the period from 1 March 2010 until 28 February 2013. |
(2) |
Therefore, new members and alternate members should be appointed for a period of three years. |
(3) |
The members and alternate members remain in office until they are replaced or reappointed, |
HAS ADOPTED THIS DECISION:
Article 1
The following are hereby appointed members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work for the period from 22 April 2013 to 28 February 2016:
I. GOVERNMENT REPRESENTATIVES
Member State |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr Christian DENEVE |
Mr Jan BATEN Mr Xavier LEBICHOT |
Bulgaria |
Ms Vaska SEMERDZHIEVA |
Mr Atanas KOLCHAKOV Ms Darina KONOVA |
Czech Republic |
Mr Jaroslav HLAVÍN |
Ms Anna SAMKOVÁ Ms Anežka SIXTOVÁ |
Denmark |
Ms Charlotte SKJOLDAGER |
Ms Annemarie KNUDSEN Ms Christine HOLM DONATZKY |
Germany |
Mr Michael KOLL |
Ms Ellen ZWINK Mr Kai SCHÄFER |
Estonia |
Ms Veronika KAIDIS |
Ms Kristel PLANGI Mr Rein REISBERG |
Ireland |
Ms Paula GOUGH |
Mr Michael WALSH Mr John NEWHAM |
Greece |
Mr Antonios CHRISTODOULOU |
Ms Stamatina PISSIMISSI Ms Aggeliki MOIROU |
Spain |
Ms Dolores LIMÓN TAMÉS |
Mr Mario GRAU RÍOS Ms Mercedes TEJEDOR AIBAR |
France |
Ms Bénédicte LEGRAND-JUNG |
Ms Sophie BARON Mr Olivier MEUNIER |
Italy |
Mr Paolo PENNESI |
Mr Lorenzo FANTINI Ms Paola CASTELLANO |
Cyprus |
Mr Leandros NICOLAIDES |
Mr Marios KOURTELLIS Mr Anastasios YIANNAKI |
Latvia |
Ms Māra VĪKSNE |
Ms Jolanta GEDUŠA Mr Renārs LŪSIS |
Lithuania |
Ms Aldona SABAITIENĖ |
Ms Vilija KONDROTIENĖ Ms Nerita ŠOT |
Luxembourg |
Mr Paul WEBER |
Mr Robert HUBERTY Mr Carlo STEFFES |
Hungary |
Mr József BAKOS |
Ms Katalin BALOGH Ms Éva GRÓNAI |
Malta |
Mr Mark GAUCI |
Mr Vincent ATTARD Mr David SALIBA |
Netherlands |
Ms Esther de KLEUVER |
Mr Martin G. DEN HELD Mr Andre MARCET |
Austria |
Ms Anna RITZBERGER-MOSER |
Ms Gertrud BREINDL Ms Gerlinde ZINIEL |
Poland |
Ms Danuta KORADECKA |
Mr Daniel Andrzej PODGÓRSKI Mr Roman SĄSIADEK |
Portugal |
Mr Pedro Nuno PIMENTA BRAZ |
Mr Carlos PEREIRA |
Romania |
Ms Livia COJOCARU |
Ms Anca PRICOP Mr Marian TĂNASE |
Slovenia |
Ms Tatjana PETRIČEK |
Mr Jože HAUKO Mr Etbin TRATNIK |
Slovakia |
Ms Romana ČERVIENKOVÁ |
Ms Eleonóra FABIÁNOVÁ Mr Erich VASELÉNYI |
Finland |
Mr Leo SUOMAA |
Ms Kristiina MUKALA Mr Wiking HUSBERG |
Sweden |
Mr Mikael SJÖBERG |
Mr Per EWALDSSON Ms Boel CALLERMO |
United Kingdom |
Mr Stuart BRISTOW |
Mr Clive FLEMING Mr Stephen TAYLOR |
II. TRADE UNION REPRESENTATIVES
Member State |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr François PHILIPS |
Mr Herman FONCK Mr Stéphane LEPOUTRE |
Bulgaria |
Mr Ivan KOKALOV |
Mr Aleksander ZAGOROV Ms Reneta VASILEVA |
Czech Republic |
Mr Jaroslav ZAVADIL |
Mr Miroslav KOSINA Mr Jindřich POLÍVKA |
Denmark |
Ms Heidi RØNNE MØLLER |
Mr Jan KAHR FREDERIKSEN |
Germany |
Ms Marina SCHRÖDER |
Mr Horst RIESENBERG-MORDEJA Ms Susanne JASPER |
Estonia |
Ms Aija MAASIKAS |
Mr Peeter ROSS Mr Ülo KRISTJUHAN |
Ireland |
Mr Sylvester CRONIN |
Ms Esther LYNCH Mr Dessie ROBINSON |
Greece |
Mr Ioannis ADAMAKIS |
Mr Andreas STOIMENIDIS Mr Efthimios THEOHARIS |
Spain |
Ms Marisa RUFINO |
Mr Pedro J. LINARES Mr Emilio GONZALEZ |
France |
Mr Gilles SEITZ |
Mr Henri FOREST |
Italy |
Ms Cinzia FRASCHERI |
Mr Marco LUPI Mr Sebastiano CALLERI |
Cyprus |
Mr Nikos SATSIAS |
Mr Nikos ANDREOU Mr Stelios CHRISTODOULOU |
Latvia |
Mr Ziedonis ANTAPSONS |
Mr Mārtiņš PUŽULS Mr Vladimirs NOVIKOVS |
Lithuania |
Ms Inga RUGINIENĖ |
Mr Petras GRĖBLIAUSKAS Mr Gediminas MOZŪRA |
Luxembourg |
Mr Serge SCHIMOFF |
Mr Marcel GOEREND Mr Robert FORNIERI |
Hungary |
|
|
Malta |
Mr Joseph CARABOTT |
Mr Edwin BALZAN Mr Chris ATTARD |
Netherlands |
Mr W. VAN VEELEN |
Mr H. VAN STEENBERGEN Ms S. BALJEU |
Austria |
Ms Ingrid REIFINGER |
Ms Julia NEDJELIK-LISCHKA Mr Alexander HEIDER |
Poland |
Ms Iwona PAWLACZYK |
Mr Dariusz GOC Mr Stanisław STOLARZ |
Portugal |
Mr Fernando José MACHADO GOMES |
Mr Georges CASULA Ms Catarina FERREIRA TAVARES |
Romania |
|
|
Slovenia |
Mr Lučka BÖHM |
Mr Aljoša ČEČ Mr Bojan GOLJEVŠČEK |
Slovakia |
Mr Peter RAMPAŠEK |
Mr Alexander TAŽÍK Mr Bohuslav BENDÍK |
Finland |
Ms Raili PERIMÄKI |
Ms Paula ILVESKIVI Mr Erkki AUVINEN |
Sweden |
Ms Christina JÄRNSTEDT |
Ms Jana FROMM Ms Karin FRISTEDT |
United Kingdom |
Mr Hugh ROBERTSON |
|
III. EMPLOYERS' REPRESENTATIVES
Member State |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr Kris DE MEESTER |
Mr Thierry VANMOL Mr Marc JUNIUS |
Bulgaria |
Mr Georgi STOEV |
Ms Daniela SIMIDCHIEVA Ms Petya GEOREVA |
Czech Republic |
Mr Karel PETRŽELKA |
Mr František HROBSKÝ Mr Martin RÖHRICH |
Denmark |
Ms Christina SODE HASLUND |
Ms Karoline KLAKSVIG Mr Sven-Peter NYGAARD |
Germany |
Mr Eckhard METZE |
Mr Rüdiger TRIEBEL Mr Stefan ENGEL |
Estonia |
Mr Marek SEPP |
Ms Marju PEÄRNBERG Ms Ülle MATT |
Ireland |
Mr Carl ANDERS |
Ms Theresa DOYLE Mr Kevin ENRIGHT |
Greece |
|
|
Spain |
Ms Isabel MAYA RUBIO |
Ms Laura CASTRILLO NUÑEZ Mr José de la CAVADA HOYO |
France |
Ms Nathalie BUET |
Mr Franck GAMBELLI Mr Patrick LÉVY |
Italy |
Ms Fabiola LEUZZI |
Mr Giorgio RUSSOMANNO Mr Pietro MASCIOCCHI |
Cyprus |
Mr Emilios MICHAEL |
Mr Polyvios POLYVIOU Ms Lena PANAGIOTOU |
Latvia |
Mr Aleksandrs GRIGORJEVS |
Ms Irēna UPZARE Mr Andris POMMERS |
Lithuania |
Mr Vaidotas LEVICKIS |
Mr Jonas GUZAVIČIUS |
Luxembourg |
Mr Pierre BLAISE |
Mr François ENGELS Mr Marc KIEFFER |
Hungary |
|
|
Malta |
Mr John SCICLUNA |
Mr Andrew Agius MUSCAT Ms Carmen BORG |
Netherlands |
Mr W.M.J.M. VAN MIERLO |
Mr R. VAN BEEK Mr J.J.H. KONING |
Austria |
Ms Christa SCHWENG |
Mr Alexander BURZ Ms Pia-Maria ROSNER-SCHEIBENGRAF |
Poland |
Mr Grzegorz JUSZCZYK |
Ms Grażyna SPYTEK-BANDURSKA |
Portugal |
Mr Luís HENRIQUE |
Mr Manuel Marcelino PENA COSTA Mr Luís Miguel CORREIA MIRA |
Romania |
Mr Ovidiu NICOLESCU |
Mr Cristian HOTOBOC Ms Irina Mirela MANOLE |
Slovenia |
Mr Igor ANTAUER |
Ms Tatjana ČERIN Mr Anže HIRŠL |
Slovakia |
Mr Róbert MEITNER |
|
Finland |
Ms Katja LEPPÄNEN |
Mr Jan SCHUGK Mr Rauno TOIVONEN |
Sweden |
Ms Bodil MELLBLOM |
Mr Ned CARTER Ms Cecilia ANDERSSON |
United Kingdom |
Mr Guy BAILEY |
|
Article 2
The Council shall appoint the members and alternate members not yet nominated at a later date.
Article 3
This Decision shall enter into force on the date of its adoption.
Article 4
This Decision shall be published for information in the Official Journal of the European Union.
Done at Luxembourg, 22 April 2013.
For the Council
The President
S. COVENEY
(1) OJ C 218, 13.9.2003, p. 1.