This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 31996D0160
96/160/EC: Commission Decision of 8 February 1996 on the appointment of members of the General Consultative Forum on the Environment (Text with EEA relevance)
96/160/EC: Commission Decision of 8 February 1996 on the appointment of members of the General Consultative Forum on the Environment (Text with EEA relevance)
96/160/EC: Commission Decision of 8 February 1996 on the appointment of members of the General Consultative Forum on the Environment (Text with EEA relevance)
OV L 37, 15.2.1996, p. 33–33
(ES, DA, DE, EL, EN, FR, IT, NL, PT, FI, SV)
No longer in force, Date of end of validity: 08/02/1999
96/160/EC: Commission Decision of 8 February 1996 on the appointment of members of the General Consultative Forum on the Environment (Text with EEA relevance)
Official Journal L 037 , 15/02/1996 P. 0033 - 0033
COMMISSION DECISION of 8 February 1996 on the appointment of members of the General Consultative Forum on the Environment (Text with EEA relevance) (96/160/EC) THE COMMISSION OF THE EUROPEAN COMMUNITIES, Having regard to the Treaty establishing the European Community, Having regard to the Commission Decision of 7 December 1993 on the setting-up of a general consultative forum on the environment (1), and in particular Article 4 thereof, Whereas the Consultative Forum set up by the abovementioned Commission Decision shall consist, according to Article 3 thereof, of 32 members; Whereas on 7 December 1993, due to a late withdrawal of a candidate, only 31 members have been appointed and one member has therefore to be appointed for the full mandate period of three years; Whereas Mr Livanos and Mr Schimmelbusch have resigned and have to be replaced for the remainder of their term of office, HAS DECIDED AS FOLLOWS: Sole Article The following are appointed as members of the General Consultative Forum on the Environment: - Ms Kerstin Lövgren, - Mr Pekka E. Kauppi, - Mr Jacques Kummer. Ms Lövgren is appointed to a full term of membership (i.e. three years from the date of this Decision). Mr Kauppi and Mr Kummer are appointed until 7 December 1996. Done at Brussels, 8 February 1996. For the Commission Ritt BJERREGAARD Member of the Commission (1) OJ No L 328, 29. 12. 1993, p. 53.