This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 52010XG0119(01)
List of appointments made by the Council — November/December 2009 (social field)
List of appointments made by the Council — November/December 2009 (social field)
List of appointments made by the Council — November/December 2009 (social field)
IO C 12, 19.1.2010, p. 3–3
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
19.1.2010 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 12/3 |
List of appointments made by the Council
November/December 2009 (social field)
2010/C 12/03
Committee |
End of term of office |
Publication in Official Journal |
Person replaced |
Resignation/appointment |
Member/alternate |
Category |
Country |
Person appointed |
Affiliation |
Date of Council Decision |
Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work |
28.2.2010 |
Mr Robert KANZ |
Resignation |
Member |
Employers |
Luxembourg |
Mr Pierre BLAISE |
Médecin-Directeur Service de Santé au Travail de l'Industrie |
22.12.2009 |
|
Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work |
28.2.2010 |
Mr Mario ALVINO |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Government |
Italy |
Mr Mauro FRANCIOSI |
Ministero del Lavoro |
22.12.2009 |
|
Advisory Committee on Social Security for Migrant Workers |
29.3.2011 |
Mr Heinrich BRAUNER |
Resignation |
Member |
Employers |
Austria |
Ms Ruth LIST |
Industriellenvereinigung |
22.12.2009 |