This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 52008XG1101(01)
List of appointments made by the Council (July, August and September 2008) (Social field)
List of appointments made by the Council (July, August and September 2008) (Social field)
List of appointments made by the Council (July, August and September 2008) (Social field)
IO C 279, 1.11.2008, p. 3–5
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
1.11.2008 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 279/3 |
List of appointments made by the Council
(July, August and September 2008) (Social field)
(2008/C 279/03)
Committee |
End of term of office |
Publication in OJ |
Person replaced |
Resignation/ appointment |
Member/ alternate |
Category |
Country |
Person appointed |
Affiliation |
Date of Council Decision |
Advisory Committee on Freedom of Movement of Workers |
13.9.2008 |
Mr Clinton NIELD |
Resignation |
Member |
Government |
United Kingdom |
Ms Seonaid WEBB |
UK Border Agency |
8.7.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Freedom of Movement of Workers |
13.9.2008 |
Mr Guy BAILEY |
Resignation |
Member |
Employers |
United Kingdom |
Mr Jim BLIGH |
CBI |
8.7.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Freedom of Movement of Workers |
13.9.2008 |
Mr Antal SZABADKAI |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Employers |
Hungary |
Ms Tünde Gabriella PETHŐ |
Union of Agrarian Employers |
15.9.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Freedom of Movement of Workers |
13.9.2008 |
Mr Olli KOSKI |
Resignation |
Member |
Workers |
Finland |
Ms Pia BJÖRKBACKA |
SAK |
15.9.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Social Security for Migrant Workers |
21.3.2009 |
Mr Jean-Luc IZARD |
Resignation |
Member |
Government |
France |
Ms Katia JULIENNE |
Ministère de la Santé et de la Protection sociale |
8.7.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Social Security for Migrant Workers |
21.3.2009 |
Ms Raluca ȘTEFAN |
Resignation |
Member |
Government |
Romania |
Ms Roxana ZLATE |
National House of Health Insurances |
8.7.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work |
28.2.2010 |
— |
Appointment |
Alternate |
Employers |
Slovakia |
Mr Štefan PETKANIČ |
Association of Chemical and Pharmaceutical Industry |
8.7.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work |
28.2.2010 |
Mr Mario GRAU-RIOS |
Resignation |
Member |
Government |
Spain |
Ms Concepción PASCUAL LIZANA |
Ministerio de Trabajo e Inmigración |
25.9.2008 |
|
Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work |
28.2.2010 |
Mr Antal SZABADKAI |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Employers |
Hungary |
Mr János RÁCZ |
Union of Agrarian Employers |
15.9.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work |
7.11.2010 |
— |
Appointment |
Member |
Employers |
Lithuania |
Mr Vaidotas LEVICKIS |
Lithuanian Business Employers' Confederation |
8.7.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work |
7.11.2010 |
— |
Appointment |
Alternate |
Employers |
Slovakia |
Mr Štefan PETKANIČ |
Association of Chemical and Pharmaceutical Industry |
8.7.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work |
7.11.2010 |
Mr Mario GRAU-RIOS |
Resignation |
Member |
Government |
Spain |
Ms Concepción PASCUAL LIZANA |
Ministerio de Trabajo e Inmigración |
25.9.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work |
7.11.2010 |
Mr Antal SZABADKAI |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Employers |
Hungary |
Mr János RÁCZ |
Union of Agrarian Employers |
25.9.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions |
30.11.2010 |
Mr Sean WARD |
Resignation |
Member |
Government |
Ireland |
Ms Anne COLEMAN-DUNNE |
Trade and Employment |
15.9.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions |
30.11.2010 |
Mr Antal SZABADKAI |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Employers |
Hungary |
Mr István KOMORÓCZKI |
Union of Agrarian Employers |
25.9.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions |
30.11.2010 |
Mr Wolfgang GREIF |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Workers |
Austria |
Mr Martin BOLKOVAC |
GPA-DJP |
25.9.2008 |
|
Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions |
30.11.2010 |
Mr Rafal BANIAK |
Resignation |
Alternate |
Employers |
Poland |
Mr Adam AMBROZIK |
Confederation of Polish Employers |
25.9.2008 |