This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32010D1127(02)
Council Decision of 22 November 2010 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions
Council Decision of 22 November 2010 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions
Council Decision of 22 November 2010 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions
OJ C 322, 27.11.2010, p. 8–11
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
No longer in force, Date of end of validity: 30/11/2013
27.11.2010 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 322/8 |
COUNCIL DECISION
of 22 November 2010
appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions
2010/C 322/03
THE COUNCIL OF THE EUROPEAN UNION,
Having regard to the Treaty on the Functioning of the European Union,
Having regard to Council Regulation (EEC) No 1365/75 of 26 May 1975 on the creation of a European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions (1), and in particular Article 6 thereof,
Having regard to the lists of candidates submitted to the Council by the Governments of the Member States and by the employees' and the employers' organisations,
Whereas:
(1) |
By its Decision of 19 November 2007 (2), the Council appointed the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions for the period from 1 December 2007 to 30 November 2010. |
(2) |
The members and alternate members of the Governing Board, representing the Governments of the Member States and employees' and employers' organisations, should be appointed for a period of three years. |
(3) |
It is for the Commission to appoint its own representatives on the Governing Board, |
HAS ADOPTED THIS DECISION:
Article 1
The following are hereby appointed members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Foundation for the Improvement of Living and Working Conditions for the period from 1 December 2010 to 30 November 2013:
I. GOVERNMENT REPRESENTATIVES
Country |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr Michel DE GOLS |
Mr Jan BATEN |
Bulgaria |
Mr Dragomir DRAGANOV |
Ms Teodora DEMIREVA |
Czech Republic |
Mr Vlastimil VÁŇA |
Ms Martina KAJÁNKOVÁ |
Denmark |
Ms Lone HENRIKSEN |
Ms Lisbet MØLLER NIELSEN |
Germany |
Mr Andreas HORST |
Mr Sebastian JOBELIUS |
Estonia |
Mr Märt MASSO |
Ms Ester RÜNKLA |
Ireland |
Mr Paul CULLEN |
|
Greece |
Ms Stamatia PISSIMISSI |
Mr Ioannis KONSTANTAKOPOULOS |
Spain |
Ms María de MINGO CORRAL |
Mr José ZAPATERO RANZ |
France |
Ms Valérie DELAHAYE-GUILLOCHEAU |
Ms Marie-Soline CHOMEL |
Italy |
|
|
Cyprus |
Mr Orestis MESSIOS |
Ms Yiota KAMBOURIDOU |
Latvia |
Ms Ineta TĀRE |
Ms Ineta VJAKSE |
Lithuania |
Ms Rita SKREBIŠKIENĖ |
Mr Evaldas BACEVIČIUS |
Luxembourg |
|
|
Hungary |
|
|
Malta |
|
|
Netherlands |
Mr Lauris BEETS |
Mr Martin BLOMSMA |
Austria |
Mr Andreas SCHALLER |
Ms Petra HRIBERNIG |
Poland |
Mr Jerzy CIECHAŃSKI |
Ms Joanna MACIEJEWSKA |
Portugal |
Mr José Luís FORTE |
Mr Fernando RIBEIRO LOPES |
Romania |
Mr Sorin Ioan BOTEZATU |
Ms Liana Ramona MOSTENESCU |
Slovenia |
Ms Vladka KOMEL |
Ms Metka ŠTOKA-DEBEVEC |
Slovakia |
|
|
Finland |
Ms Pirjo HARJUNEN |
Mr Antti NÄRHINEN |
Sweden |
Mr Per NYSTRÖM |
Ms Åsa FORSSELL |
United Kingdom |
|
|
II. REPRESENTATIVES OF EMPLOYEES' ORGANISATIONS
Country |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr Herman FONCK |
Mr François PHILIPS |
Bulgaria |
Ms Keti KOYNAKOVA |
Mr Ivan KOKALOV |
Czech Republic |
Ms Hana MÁLKOVÁ |
Mr Tomáš PAVELKA |
Denmark |
Mr Ole PRASZ |
|
Germany |
Mr Dieter POUGIN |
Ms Friederike POSSELT |
Estonia |
Mr Kalle KALDA |
Ms Kadi ALATALU |
Ireland |
Ms Sally Anne KINAHAN |
Mr Liam BERNEY |
Greece |
|
|
Spain |
Ms Antonia RAMOS |
Mr Ramón BAEZA |
France |
Mr Emmanuel COUVREUR |
|
Italy |
Mr Uliano STENDARDI |
Ms Giulia BARBUICCI |
Cyprus |
Mr Nicolaos EPISTITHIOU |
Mr Andreas MATSAS |
Latvia |
Ms Ruta PORNIECE |
Ms Linda ROMELE |
Lithuania |
Ms Kristina KRUPAVIČIENĖ |
Ms Danutė ŠLIONSKIENĖ |
Luxembourg |
Ms Viviane GOERGEN |
Mr René PIZZAFERRI |
Hungary |
Ms Erzsébet HANTI |
|
Malta |
Mr William PORTELLI |
|
Netherlands |
Mr Erik PENTENGA |
Mr Leon MEIJER |
Austria |
Ms Karin ZIMMERMANN |
Ms Sonja FREITAG |
Poland |
Mr Bogdan OLSZEWSKI |
Mr Piotr OSTROWSKI |
Portugal |
Mr Vítor Manuel Vicente COELHO |
Mr Armando FARIAS |
Romania |
Ms Cecilia GOSTIN |
|
Slovenia |
Mr Pavle VRHOVEC |
Ms Maja KONJAR |
Slovakia |
Mr Erik MACÁK |
Ms Margita DÖMÉNYOVÁ |
Finland |
Mr Juha ANTILA |
Ms Leila KURKI |
Sweden |
Mr Mats ESSEMYR |
Mr Sten GELLERSTEDT |
United Kingdom |
Mr Hugh ROBERTSON |
Ms Elena CRASTA |
III. REPRESENTATIVES OF EMPLOYERS' ORGANISATIONS
Country |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr Kris DE MEESTER |
Mr Roland WAEYAERT |
Bulgaria |
Mr Dimiter BRANKOV |
Mr Nikola ZIKATANOV |
Czech Republic |
Ms Vladimíra DRBALOVÁ |
Ms Pavla BŘEČKOVÁ |
Denmark |
Mr Benjamin HOLST |
Mr Nils Juhl ANDREASEN |
Germany |
Mr Lutz MÜHL |
Ms Renate HORNUNG-DRAUS |
Estonia |
Ms Eve PÄÄRENDSON |
Mr Tarmo KRIIS |
Ireland |
Mr Brendan McGINTY |
Mr Eamonn McCOY |
Greece |
Ms Rena BARDANI |
Ms Christina GEORGANTA |
Spain |
Mr Miguel CANALES GUTIÉRREZ |
Ms Rosario ESCOLAR POLO |
France |
Mr Emmanuel JAHAN |
Mr Emmanuel JULIEN |
Italy |
Ms Stefania ROSSI |
Ms Paola ASTORRI |
Cyprus |
Ms Lena PANAYIOTOU |
Mr Polyvios POLYVIOU |
Latvia |
Mr Eduards FILIPPOVS |
Ms Anita LICE |
Lithuania |
Mr Andrius GUZAVIČIUS |
Ms Dovilė BAŠKYTĖ |
Luxembourg |
Mr Pierre OESCH |
Ms Magalie LYSIAK |
Hungary |
Mr Antal CSUPORT |
Mr Istvan KOMOROCZKI |
Malta |
Mr Santo PORTERA |
|
Netherlands |
Mr W. M. J. M. VAN MIERLO |
Mr Gerard A. M. VAN DER GRIND |
Austria |
Ms Ruth LIST |
Ms Heidrun MAIER-DE-KRUIJFF |
Poland |
Mr Piotr SARNECKI |
Mr Adam AMBROZIK |
Portugal |
Mr Marcelino PENA E COSTA |
Mr António VERGUEIRO |
Romania |
|
|
Slovenia |
Ms Tatjana PAJNKIHAR |
Mr Igor ANTAUER |
Slovakia |
Mr Martin HOŠTÁK |
Ms Viola KROMEROVÁ |
Finland |
Mr Seppo SAUKKONEN |
Ms Anu SAJAVAARA |
Sweden |
Mr Sverker RUDEBERG |
Mr Niklas BECKMAN |
United Kingdom |
Mr Neil CARBERRY |
Mr Ben DIGBY |
Article 2
The Council will appoint the members and alternate members not yet nominated at a later date.
Article 3
This Decision shall enter into force on the date of its adoption.
Done at Brussels, 22 November 2010.
For the Council
The President
S. VANACKERE
(1) OJ L 139, 30.5.1975, p. 1.
(2) OJ C 282, 24.11.2007, p. 10.