This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32014D0614(01)
Council Decision of 12 June 2014 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for Lithuania and Malta
Council Decision of 12 June 2014 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for Lithuania and Malta
Council Decision of 12 June 2014 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for Lithuania and Malta
OJ C 182, 14.6.2014, p. 14–15
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, HR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
No longer in force, Date of end of validity: 07/11/2016
14.6.2014 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 182/14 |
COUNCIL DECISION
of 12 June 2014
appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for Lithuania and Malta
2014/C 182/03
THE COUNCIL OF THE EUROPEAN UNION,
Having regard to the Treaty on the Functioning of the European Union,
Having regard to Council Regulation (EC) No 2062/94 of 18 July 1994 establishing a European Agency for Safety and Health at Work (1), and in particular Article 8 thereof,
Having regard to the lists of candidates submitted to the Council by the Governments of the Member States and by the employees’ and the employers’ organisations,
Having regard to the lists of members and alternate members of the Advisory Committee on Safety and Health at Work,
Whereas:
(1) |
By its Decision of 2 December 2013 (2), the Council appointed the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for the period ending on 7 November 2016. |
(2) |
The employees’ organisation ETUC and the employers’ organisation BUSINESSEUROPE have submitted nominations for several posts to be filled, |
HAS ADOPTED THIS DECISION:
Article 1
The following shall be appointed as members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for the period ending on 7 November 2016:
II. REPRESENTATIVES OF EMPLOYEES’ ORGANISATIONS
Country |
Member |
Alternate |
Lithuania |
Ms Inga RUGINIENĖ |
Mr Petras GRĖBLIAUSKAS |
III. REPRESENTATIVES OF EMPLOYERS’ ORGANISATIONS
Country |
Member |
Alternate |
Lithuania |
Mr Vaidotas LEVICKIS |
Mr Jonas GUZAVIČIUS |
Malta |
Mr Andrew Agius MUSCAT |
Mr John SCICLUNA |
Article 2
The Council will appoint the members and alternate members not yet nominated at a later date.
Article 3
This Decision shall enter into force on the date of its adoption.
Done at Luxembourg, 12 June 2014.
For the Council
The President
Y. MANIATIS
(1) OJ L 216, 20.8.1994, p. 1.
(2) Council Decision of 2 December 2013 appointing the members and alternate members of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work (OJ C 360, 10.12.2013, p. 8).