This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32007D0666
2007/666/EC: Commission Decision of 9 October 2007 on the appointment of one member of the European Group on Ethics in Science and New Technologies for its third mandate
2007/666/EC: Commission Decision of 9 October 2007 on the appointment of one member of the European Group on Ethics in Science and New Technologies for its third mandate
2007/666/EC: Commission Decision of 9 October 2007 on the appointment of one member of the European Group on Ethics in Science and New Technologies for its third mandate
OJ L 271, 16.10.2007, p. 15–15
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
In force
16.10.2007 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
L 271/15 |
COMMISSION DECISION
of 9 October 2007
on the appointment of one member of the European Group on Ethics in Science and New Technologies for its third mandate
(2007/666/EC)
THE COMMISSION OF THE EUROPEAN COMMUNITIES,
Having regard to the Treaty establishing the European Community,
Having regard to Commission Decision 2005/383/EC of 11 May 2005 (1) on the renewal of the mandate of the European Group on Ethics in Science and New Technologies,
Whereas:
(1) |
Dr C. CASINI has resigned as a Member of the EGE, consequently to his appointment as MEP, by letter of 12 July 2006. |
(2) |
On 15 March 2007 the Commission published a call for applications regarding the selection of a new member of the European Group on Ethics in Science and New Technologies and a Jury composed of senior Commission staff has evaluated the applications received and prepared a shortlist for the Commission Decision, |
HAS DECIDED AS FOLLOWS:
Article 1
Mr Francesco D. BUSNELLI is appointed as EGE member for the period covered by the current EGE (2005-09), as a replacement of former EGE Member Carlo CASINI.
Article 2
The new EGE member’s mandate enters into force on the same day as the adoption of the present Decision.
Done at Brussels, 9 October 2007.
For the Commission
The President
José Manuel BARROSO