This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32020D0102
Council Decision (EU) 2020/102 of 20 January 2020 appointing the members and alternate members of the Committee of the Regions for the period from 26 January 2020 to 25 January 2025
Rådets beslut (EU) 2020/102 av den 20 januari 2020 om utnämning av ledamöter och suppleanter i Regionkommittén för perioden 26 januari 2020–25 januari 2025
Rådets beslut (EU) 2020/102 av den 20 januari 2020 om utnämning av ledamöter och suppleanter i Regionkommittén för perioden 26 januari 2020–25 januari 2025
ST/14986/2019/INIT
EUT L 20, 24.1.2020, p. 2–16
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, GA, HR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
In force: This act has been changed. Current consolidated version: 24/01/2020
24.1.2020 |
SV |
Europeiska unionens officiella tidning |
L 20/2 |
RÅDETS BESLUT (EU) 2020/102
av den 20 januari 2020
om utnämning av ledamöter och suppleanter i Regionkommittén för perioden 26 januari 2020–25 januari 2025
EUROPEISKA UNIONENS RÅD HAR ANTAGIT DETTA BESLUT
med beaktande av fördraget om Europeiska unionens funktionssätt, särskilt artiklarna 300.3 och 305,
med beaktande av rådets beslut (EU) 2019/852 av den 21 maj 2019 om fastställande av Regionkommitténs sammansättning (1),
med beaktande av de förslag som varje medlemsstat har lagt fram, och
av följande skäl:
(1) |
I artikel 300.3 i fördraget föreskrivs att Regionkommittén ska bestå av företrädare för regionala och lokala organ som antingen har valts till ett regionalt eller lokalt organ eller är politiskt ansvariga inför en vald församling. |
(2) |
I artikel 305 i fördraget föreskrivs att Regionkommitténs ledamöter och lika många suppleanter ska utses av rådet för en femårsperiod i enlighet med förslag från varje medlemsstat. |
(3) |
Eftersom mandattiden för Regionkommitténs ledamöter och suppleanter löper ut den 25 januari 2020, bör nya ledamöter och suppleanter utnämnas. |
(4) |
Den 10 december 2019 antog rådet beslut (EU) 2019/2157 (2). Genom det beslutet utnämndes för perioden 26 januari 2020–25 januari 2025 ledamöter och suppleanter som föreslagits av de tjeckiska, danska, estniska, cypriotiska, lettiska, luxemburgska, nederländska, österrikiska, rumänska, slovenska, slovakiska och svenska regeringarna. Genom beslut (EU) 2019/2157 utnämndes även för samma period 3 ledamöter som föreslagits av den belgiska regeringen, 21 ledamöter och 20 suppleanter som föreslagits av den tyska regeringen, 16 ledamöter och 16 suppleanter som föreslagits av den spanska regeringen, 8 ledamöter och 8 suppleanter som föreslagits av den irländska regeringen, 10 ledamöter och 14 suppleanter som föreslagits av den italienska regeringen, 4 ledamöter och 4 suppleanter som föreslagits av den maltesiska regeringen och 8 ledamöter och 8 suppleanter som föreslagits av den finländska regeringen. Ledamöter och suppleanter vars nomineringar inte hade meddelats rådet före den 15 november 2019 kunde inte tas med i beslut (EU) 2019/2157. |
(5) |
Den 20 december 2019 överlämnades ytterligare förteckningar till rådet, nämligen förteckningen över ledamöter och suppleanter som föreslagits av de grekiska, franska, kroatiska, litauiska, ungerska och portugisiska regeringarna, samt förteckningen över 4 ledamöter och 4 suppleanter som föreslagits av den belgiska regeringen, förteckningen över en ledamot som föreslagits av den bulgariska regeringen, förteckningen över en ledamot och en suppleant som föreslagits av den irländska regeringen, förteckningen över en ledamot och en suppleant som föreslagits av den spanska regeringen, förteckningen över 14 ledamöter och 10 suppleanter som föreslagits av den italienska regeringen och förteckningen över 21 ledamöter och 20 suppleanter som föreslagits av den polska regeringen. Dessa ledamöter och suppleanter bör utnämnas för samma period, från den 26 januari 2020 till den 25 januari 2025, som de ledamöter och suppleanter som utnämndes genom beslut (EU) 2019/2157. |
(6) |
Den utnämningen kommer att följas av utnämning vid en senare tidpunkt av övriga ledamöter och suppleanter vars nominering inte meddelats rådet före den 20 december 2019. |
HÄRIGENOM FÖRESKRIVS FÖLJANDE.
Artikel 1
Till Regionkommittén utnämns härmed för perioden 26 januari 2020–25 januari 2025,
— |
som ledamöter, de personer som för varje medlemsstat anges i bilaga I, |
— |
som suppleanter, de personer som för varje medlemsstat anges i bilaga II. |
Artikel 2
Detta beslut träder i kraft samma dag som det antas.
Utfärdat i Bryssel den 20 januari 2020.
På rådets vägnar
J. BORRELL FONTELLES
Ordförande
(1) EUT L 139, 27.5.2019, s. 13.
(2) Rådets beslut (EU) 2019/2157 av den 10 december 2019 om utnämning av ledamöter och suppleanter i Regionkommittén för perioden 26 januari 2020–25 januari 2025 (EUT L 327, 17.12.2019, s. 78).
BILAGA I
ПРИЛОЖЕНИЕ I - ANEXO I - PŘÍLOHA I - BILAG I - ANHANG I - I LISA - ΠΑΡΑΡΤΗΜΑ Ι - ANNEX I - ANNEXE I - PRILOG I - ALLEGATO I - I PIELIKUMS - I PRIEDAS - I. MELLÉKLET - ANNESS I - BIJLAGE I -ZAŁĄCZNIK I - ANEXO I - ANEXA I - PRÍLOHA I - PRILOGA I - LIITE I - BILAGA I
Членове / Miembros / Členové / Medlemmer / Mitglieder / Liikmed / Μέλη / Members / Membres / Članovi / Membri / Locekļi / Nariai / Tagok / Membri / Leden / Członkowie / Membros / Membri / Členovia / Člani / Jäsenet / Ledamöter
BELGIË / BELGIQUE / BELGIEN
Mr Willy BORSUS
Member of a Local Assembly: Municipal Council of Marche-en-Famenne
Mr Elio DI RUPO
Member of a Regional Executive: Minister-President of the Government of Wallonia
Mr Emmanuel DISABATO
Member of a Regional Assembly: Parliament of Wallonia
Mr Pierre-Yves JEHOLET
Member of a Regional Executive: Minister-President of the Government of the Federation Wallonia-Brussels
БЪЛГАРИЯ
Ms Tanya HRISTOVA
Member of a Local Executive: Mayor of Gabrovo Municipality
ΕΛΛΑΣ
Mr Georgios PATOULIS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Attica
Mr Apostolos TZITZIKOSTAS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Central Macedonia
Mr Stavros ARNAOUTAKIS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Crete
Ms Rodi KRATSA
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Ionian Islands
Mr Georgios CHATZIMARKOS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of South Aegean
Mr Konstantinos AGORASTOS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Thessaly
Mr Konstantinos BAKOYANNIS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Athens
Mr Andreas KONDYLIS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Alimos
Mr Moses ELISAF
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Ioannina
Mr Dimitrios KARNAVOS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Kallithea
Mr Ignatios KAITEZIDIS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Pilea-Hortiatis
Mr Symeon ROUSSOS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Chalandri
ESPAÑA
Mr Fernando LÓPEZ MIRAS
Member of a Regional Assembly: Asamblea Regional de Murcia
FRANCE
Ms Danièle BOEGLIN
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de l’Aube
Ms Isabelle BOUDINEAU
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de Nouvelle-Aquitaine
Mr Frank CECCONI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional d’Ile-de-France
Ms Vanessa CHARBONNEAU
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional des Pays de la Loire
Mr Vincent CHAUVET
Member of a Local Executive: Commune d’Autun (71)
Mr Loïg CHESNAIS-GIRARD
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de Bretagne
Ms Yolaine COSTES
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de la Réunion
Mr Guillaume CROS
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional d’Occitanie
Mr François DECOSTER
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional des Hauts de France
Ms Mélanie FORTIER
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional du Centre Val de Loire
Ms Cécile GALLIEN
Member of a Local Executive: commune de Voray (43)
Ms Karine GLOANEC-MAURIN
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Couëtron-au-Perche (département du Loir-et-Cher)
Ms Agnès LE BRUN
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Morlaix (département du Finistère)
Mr Pascal MANGIN
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional du Grand Est
Ms Sylvie MARCILLY
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de la Charente-Maritime
Ms Marie-Antoinette MAUPERTUIS
Member of a Regional Assembly: Collectivité territoriale de Corse
Mr Jean-Paul POURQUIER
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de la Lozère
Mr Franck PROUST
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Nîmes (département du Gard)
Ms Agnès RAMPAL
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional Provence-Alpes-Côte d’Azur
Mr Christophe ROUILLON
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Coulaines (département de la Sarthe)
Ms Nathalie SARRABEZOLLES
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental du Finistère
Mr Patrice VERCHÈRE
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional Auvergne-Rhône-Alpes
Mr Jean-Noël VERFAILLIE
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental du Nord
Mr André VIOLA
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de l’Aude
HRVATSKA
Mr Nikola DOBROSLAVIĆ
Member of Regional Executive: Dubrovnik-Neretva County
Mr Valter DRANDIĆ
Member of Regional Assembly: Istria County
Mr Ivan GULAM
Member of Local Executive: Municipality of Pirovac
Mr Bruno HRANIĆ
Member of Local Executive: Municipality of Vidovec
Mr Danijel MARUŠIĆ
Member of Regional Executive: Brod-Posavina County
Mr Vojko OBERSNEL
Member of Local Executive: City of Rijeka
Mr Goran PAUK
Member of Regional Executive: Šibenik-Knin County
Ms Jelena PAVIČIĆ VUKIČEVIĆ
Member of Local Executive: City of Zagreb
Mr Željko TURK
Member of Local Executive: City of Zaprešić
IRELAND
Ms Caroline DWANE STANLEY
Member of a Local Executive: Laois County Council
ITALIA
Ms Manuela BORA
Assessore e Consigliere regionale della Regione Marche
Mr Roberto CIAMBETTI
Presidente del Consiglio e Consigliere regionale della Regione Veneto
Mr Alberto CIRIO
Presidente della Regione Piemonte
Mr Massimiliano FEDRIGA
Presidente della Regione Friuli Venezia Giulia
Mr Alessandro FERMI
Presidente del Consiglio e Consigliere regionale della Regione Lombardia
Mr Nicola IRTO
Presidente del Consiglio e Consigliere regionale della Regione Calabria
Mr Marco MARSILIO
Presidente della Regione Abruzzo
Mr Sebastiano MUSUMECI
Presidente della Regione Siciliana
Mr Enrico ROSSI
Presidente della Regione Toscana
Ms Simonetta SALIERA
Presidente dell’Assemblea legislativa e Consigliere regionale della Regione Emilia Romagna
Ms Alessandra SARTORE
Assessore della Regione Lazio
Mr Christian SOLINAS
Presidente della Regione Sardegna
Mr Donato TOMA
Presidente della Regione Molise
Mr Luca ZAIA
Presidente della Regione Veneto
LIETUVA
Mr Valdas BENKUNSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Vilniaus miesto savivaldybės taryba
Ms Nijolė DIRGINČIENĖ
Member of a Local Assembly: Birštono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Vytautas GRUBLIAUSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Klaipėdos miesto savivaldybės taryba
Mr Dovydas KAMINSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Tauragės rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Ričardas MALINAUSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Druskininkų savivaldybės taryba
Mr Bronius MARKAUSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Klaipėdos rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Mindaugas SINKEVIČIUS
Member of a Local Assembly: Jonavos rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Algirdas VRUBLIAUSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Alytaus rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Povilas ŽAGUNIS
Member of a Local Assembly: Panevėžio rajono savivaldybės taryba
MAGYARORSZÁG
Mr István BÓKA
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Balatonfüred
Ms Barbara Szilvia HEGEDŰS
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Veszprém with county rights
Mr Jácint HORVÁTH
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Nagykanizsa with county rights
Mr János Ádám KARÁCSONY
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Tahitótfalu
Mr József KÓBOR
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Pécs with county rights
Mr Lajos KOVÁCS
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of District 12 of Budapest
Ms Anna MAGYAR
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Csongrád Megye
Mr László MAJTÉNYI
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Vas Megye
Mr József RIBÁNYI
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Tolna Megye
Mr Patrik SCHWARCZ-KIEFER
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Baranya Megye
Mr Oszkár SESZTÁK
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Szabolcs-Szatmár-Bereg Megye
Ms Kata TÜTTŐ
Member of a Local Assembly: General Assembly of Budapest
POLSKA
Mr Gustaw Marek BRZEZIN
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Warmińsko-Mazurskiego
Ms Aleksandra DULKIEWICZ
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent Miasta Gdańska
Mr Mariusz Rafał FRANKOWSKI
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada m. st. Warszawy
Mr Olgierd GEBLEWICZ
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Zachodniopomorskiego
Mr Paweł GRZYBOWSKI
Member of a Local Executive: Burmistrz Miasta Rypin
Mr Krzysztof IWANIUK
Member of a Local Executive: Wójt Gminy Terespol
Mr Józef JODŁOWSKI
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada Powiatu Rzeszowskiego
Mr Robert KOŚCIUK
Member of a Local Executive: Burmistrz Krasnegostawu
Mr Witold Rafał KOZŁOWSKI
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Zarząd Województwa Małopolskiego
Mr Krzysztof Adam MATYJASZCZYK
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent Miasta Częstochowa
Mr Władysław ORTYL
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Podkarpackiego
Mr Cezary Adam PRZYBYLSKI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Dolnośląskiego
Mr Grzegorz Zenon SCHREIBER
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Zarząd Województwa Łódzkiego
Mr Jarosław Piotr STAWIARSKI
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Zarząd Województwa Lubelskiego
Mr Dariusz STRUGAŁA
Member of a Local Executive: Burmistrz Miasta i Gminy Jaraczewo
Mr Mieczysław STRUK
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Pomorskiego
Mr Adam Krzysztof STRUZIK
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Mazowieckiego
Mr Rafał Kazimierz TRZASKOWSKI
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent m. st. Warszawy
Mr Ludwik Kajetan WĘGRZYN
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada Powiatu w Bochni
Mr Marek WOŹNIAK
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Wielkopolskiego
Ms Hanna ZDANOWSKA
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent Miasta Łodzi
PORTUGAL
Mr Vasco Ilídio ALVES CORDEIRO
Member of a Regional Executive: Governo Regional dos Açores
Mr Miguel Filipe MACHADO DE ALBUQUERQUE
Member of a Regional Executive: Governo Regional da Madeira
Mr Aires Henrique DO COUTO PEREIRA
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal da Póvoa de Varzim
Mr Basílio Adolfo DE MENDONÇA HORTA DA FRANÇA
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Sintra
Ms Cristina de Fátima SILVA CALISTO
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Lagoa - Açores
Mr Fernando Medina Maciel ALMEIDA CORREIA
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Lisboa
Mr Hélder António GUERRA DE SOUSA SILVA
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Mafra
Ms Isilda Maria Prazeres DOS SANTOS VARGES GOMES
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Portimão
Mr José Agostinho RIBAU ESTEVES
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Aveiro
Mr José Maria DA CUNHA COSTA
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Viana do Castelo
Mr Luís Miguel DA SILVA MENDONÇA ALVES
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Caminha
Mr Ricardo Bruno Antunes MACHADO RIO
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Braga
BILAGA II
ПРИЛОЖЕНИЕ II - ANEXO II - PŘÍLOHA II - BILAG II - ANHANG II - II LISA - ΠΑΡΑΡΤΗΜΑ ΙΙ - ANNEX II - ANNEXE II - PRILOG II - ALLEGATO II - II PIELIKUMS - II PRIEDAS - II. MELLÉKLET - ANNESS II - BIJLAGE II - ZAŁĄCZNIK II - ANEXO II - ANEXA II - PRÍLOHA II - PRILOGA II - LIITE II - BILAGA II
Заместник-членове / Suplentes / Náhradníci / Suppleanter / Stellvertreter / Asendusliikmed / Αναπληρωτές / Alternate members / Suppléants / Zamjenici članova / Supplenti / Aizstājēji / Pakaitiniai nariai / Póttagok / Membri Supplenti / Plaatsvervangers / Zastępcy członków / Suplentes / Supleanți / Náhradníci / Nadomestni člani / Varajäsenet / Suppleanter
BELGIË / BELGIQUE / BELGIEN
Mr Hugues BAYET
Member of a Local Executive: Mayor of Farciennes
Ms Alexia BERTRAND
Member of a Regional Assembly: Parliament of Brussels-Capital Region
Ms Hélène RYCKMANS
Member of a Regional Assembly: Parliament of Wallonia
Ms Olga ZRIHEN
Member of a Local Assembly: Municipal Council of La Louvière
ΕΛΛΑΣ
Mr Dimitrios PETROVITS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Eastern Macedonia and Thrace
Mr Alexandros KACHRIMANIS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Epirus
Mr Nektarios FARMAKIS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Western Greece
Mr Fanis SPANOS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Central Greece
Mr Georgios KASAPIDIS
Member of a Regional Executive: Region of Western Macedonia
Ms Dimitra ANGELAKI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Region of Attica
Mr Dimitrios KALOGEROPOULOS
Representative of a local body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Municipality of Palaio Faliro
Mr Nikolaos VAFEIADIS
Member of a Local Assembly: Municipality of Athens
Mr Konstantinos TZIOUMIS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Tripoli
Ms Katerina CHRYSSOPOULOU
Member of a Local Assembly: Municipality of Vrilissia
Mr Nikolaos CHIOTAKIS
Member of a Local Assembly: Municipality of Kifissia
Mr Efstratios CHARCHALAKIS
Member of a Local Executive: Municipality of Kythira
ESPAÑA
Mr Juan José MARTÍNEZ LOZANO
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Asamblea Regional de Murcia
FRANCE
Mr Patrick AYACHE
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de Bourgogne Franche-Comté
Mr Jean-François BARNIER
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal du Chambon-Feugerolles (département de la Loire)
Ms Nadine BELLUROT
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Reuilly (département de l’Indre)
Ms Claudette BRUNET LECHENAULT
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de Saône-et-Loire
Mr Christophe CLERGEAU
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional des Pays de Loire
Ms Emmanuelle de GENTILI
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Bastia (Corse)
Mr Christian GILLET
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental du Maine-et-Loire
Ms Aurélie GROS
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional d’Ile-de-France
Mr Thibaut GUIGNARD
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Plœuc-l’Hermitage (département des Côtes-d’Armor)
Mr Mathieu KLEIN
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de Meurthe-et-Moselle
Ms Sylvie LABADENS
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental du Nord
Mr Gérard LAHELLEC
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de Bretagne
Mr Miguel LAVENTURE
Member of a Regional Assembly: Collectivité territoriale de Martinique
Ms Françoise MESNARD
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Saint-Jean d’Angely (département de Charente-Maritime)
Ms Nicole MULLER BECKER
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional du Grand Est
Ms Marie-Luce PENCHARD
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de Guadeloupe
Ms Nicole PEYCELON
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional Auvergne-Rhône-Alpes
Ms Nicole PIERRARD
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental de la Moselle
Ms Martine PINVILLE
Member of a Regional Assembly: Conseil régional de Nouvelle-Aquitaine
Mr François-Xavier PRIOLLAUD
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de Normandie
Mr Bertrand RINGOT
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil municipal de Gravelines (département du Nord)
Mr Didier ROBERT
Member of a Regional Executive: Conseil régional de la Réunion
Mr Gilles SIMEONI
Member of a Regional Executive: Collectivité territoriale de Corse
Mr Claude WALLENDORFF
Member of a Local Executive: Conseil départemental des Ardennes
HRVATSKA
Mr Igor ANDROVIĆ
Member of Regional Executive: Virovitica-Podravina County
Mr Martin BARIČEVIĆ
Member of Local Executive: Municipality of Jasenice
Ms Antonija JOZIĆ
Member of Local Executive: City of Pleternica
Mr Darko KOREN
Member of Regional Executive: Koprivnica-Križevci County
Mr Anteo MILOS
Member of Local Executive: City of Novigrad-Cittanova
Ms Jasna PETEK
Member of Regional Executive: Krapina-Zagorje County
Mr Dinko PIRAK
Member of Local Executive: City of Čazma
Mr Matija POSAVEC
Member of Regional Executive: Međimurje County
Mr Slavko PRIŠĆAN
Member of Local Executive: Municipality of Rovišće
IRELAND
Mr Conor MCGUINNESS
Member of a Local Executive: Galway Waterford City and County Council
ITALIA
Mr Gaetano ARMAO
Vicepresidente e Assessore della Regione Siciliana
Mr Vito BARDI
Presidente della Regione Basilicata
Mr Vincenzo DE LUCA
Presidente della Regione Campania
Mr Arno KOMPATSCHER
Presidente e Consigliere provinciale della Provincia autonoma di Bolzano
Mr Pierluigi MARQUIS
Consigliere regionale della Regione Autonoma della Valle d’Aosta
Mr Michele PAIS
Presidente del Consiglio e Consigliere regionale della Regione Sardegna
Mr Alessandro PIANA
Presidente del Consiglio e Consigliere regionale della Regione Liguria
Ms Donatella PORZI
Consigliere regionale della Regione Umbria
Mr Francesco RUSSO
Vice Presidente e Assessore della Regione Calabria
Mr Piero Mauro ZANIN
Presidente del Consiglio e Consigliere regionale della Regione Friuli Venezia Giulia
LIETUVA
Mr Arnoldas ABRAMAVIČIUS
Member of a Local Assembly: Zarasų rajono savivaldybės taryba
Ms Vaida ALEKNAVIČIENĖ
Member of a Local Assembly: Joniškio rajono savivaldybės taryba
Ms Aleksandra GRIGIENĖ
Member of a Local Assembly: Visagino savivaldybės taryba
Mr Domas GRIŠKEVIČIUS
Member of a Local Assembly: Šiaulių miesto savivaldybės taryba
Mr Ramūnas GODELIAUSKAS
Member of a Local Assembly: Rokiškio rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Audrius KLIŠONIS
Member of a Local Assembly: Plungės rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Algirdas NEIBERKA
Member of a Local Assembly: Vilkaviškio rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Vytenis TOMKUS
Member of a Local Assembly: Kaišiadorių rajono savivaldybės taryba
Mr Mantas VARAŠKA
Member of a Local Assembly: Kazlų Rūdos savivaldybės taryba
MAGYARORSZÁG
Ms Boglárka BÁNNÉ GÁL
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén Megye
Mr Attila KISS
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Hajdúböszörmény
Mr Erik KONCZER
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Komárom-Esztergom Megye
Mr Raymund KOVÁCS
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of District 16 of Budapest
Mr Ádám MIRKÓCZKI
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Eger
Mr Zoltán NÉMETH
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Győr-Moson-Sopron Megye
Mr Attila PÁL
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Zala Megye
Mr Gábor SIMON
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Miskolc with county rights
Mr Nándor SKUCZI
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Nógrád Megye
Mr Róbert SZABÓ
Member of a Regional Assembly: County Council of Heves Megye
Mr Ferenc TEMERINI
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Soltvadkert
Mr Botond VÁNTSA
Member of a Local Assembly: Local Government of Szigetszentmiklós
POLSKA
Mr Andrzej Krzysztof BĘTKOWSKI
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Zarząd Województwa Świętokrzyskiego
Mr Rafał BRUSKI
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent Miasta Bydgoszczy
Mr Andrzej BUŁA
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Zarząd Województwa Opolskiego
Mr Marian BURAS
Member of a Local Executive: Burmistrz Miasta i Gminy Morawica
Mr Piotr Franciszek CAŁBECKI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Kujawsko-Pomorskiego
Mr Jakub Piotr CHEŁSTOWSKI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Śląskiego
Mr Jacek GAJEWSKI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Kujawsko-Pomorskiego
Mr Robert GODEK
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada Powiatu Strzyżowskiego
Mr Wojciech Jan KAŁUŻA
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Śląskiego
Mr Jakub Michał KWAŚNY
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada Miasta Tarnowa
Mr Mirosław LECH
Member of a Local Executive: Wójt Gminy Korycin
Mr Sebastian ŁUKASZEWICZ
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Podlaskiego
Ms Beata Małgorzata MOSKAL-SŁANIEWSKA
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent Miasta Świdnica
Ms Elżbieta Anna POLAK
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Lubuskiego
Mr Piotr Paweł PSIKUS
Member of a Local Executive: Burmistrz Miasta i Gminy Kępno
Mr Ludwik Jerzy RAKOWSKI
Member of a Regional Assembly: Sejmik Województwa Mazowieckiego
Mr Łukasz Jakub SMÓŁKA
Representative of a regional body with political accountability to an elected Assembly: Zarząd Województwa Małopolskiego
Mr Joachim SMYŁA
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada Powiatu w Lublińcu
Mr Marek Andrzej TRAMŚ
Member of a Local Assembly: Rada Powiatu Polkowickiego
Mr Tadeusz TRUSKOLASKI
Member of a Local Executive: Prezydent Miasta Białegostoku
PORTUGAL
Mr Rui Jorge DA SILVA LEITE DE BETTENCOURT
Member of a Regional Executive: Governo Regional dos Açores
Mr Pedro Miguel AMARO DE BETTENCOURT CALADO
Member of a Regional Executive: Governo Regional da Madeira
Ms Anabela GASPAR DE FREITAS
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Tomar
Mr Carlos André TELES PAULO DE CARVALHO
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Tabuaço
Mr Carlos SILVA SANTIAGO
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Sernancelhe
Mr Luís Manuel DOS SANTOS CORREIA
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Castelo Branco
Mr Luís Miguel CORREIA ANTUNES
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal da Lousã
Mr Nuno José GONÇALVES MASCARENHAS
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Sines
Mr Paulo Jorge FRAZÃO BATISTA DOS SANTOS
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal da Batalha
Mr Pedro Miguel CÉSAR RIBEIRO
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Almeirim
Mr Rui Miguel DA SILVA ANDRÉ
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de Monchique
Mr Vítor Manuel MARTINS GUERREIRO
Member of a Local Executive: Câmara Municipal de São Brás de Alportel