This document is an excerpt from the EUR-Lex website
Document 32007D1114(01)
Council Decision of 8 November 2007 appointing members and alternates of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work
Council Decision of 8 November 2007 appointing members and alternates of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work
Council Decision of 8 November 2007 appointing members and alternates of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work
IO C 271, 14.11.2007, p. 4–7
(BG, ES, CS, DA, DE, ET, EL, EN, FR, IT, LV, LT, HU, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SK, SL, FI, SV)
No longer in force, Date of end of validity: 07/11/2010
14.11.2007 |
EN |
Official Journal of the European Union |
C 271/4 |
COUNCIL DECISION
of 8 November 2007
appointing members and alternates of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work
(2007/C 271/04)
THE COUNCIL OF THE EUROPEAN UNION,
Having regard to Council Regulation (EC) No 2062/94 of 18 July 1994 establishing a European Agency for Safety and Health at Work (1), and in particular Article 8 thereof,
Having regard to the list of nominations for appointment submitted to the Council by the Governments of the Member States,
Having regard to the lists of nominations for appointment submitted to the Council by the Chairman of the Advisory Committee on Safety, Hygiene and Health at Work as regards the proposals of the groups of members representing employers' and employees' organisations within that Committee,
Whereas:
(1) |
By its Decision of 3 June 2002 (2) the Council appointed the members and alternates of the Administrative Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for the period from 3 June 2002 to 2 June 2005. |
(2) |
By its Decision of 15 November 2004 (3), the Council appointed the members and alternates representing the new Member States. |
(3) |
The Administrative Board remained in office pending the entry into force of Council Regulation (EC) No 1112/2005, amending Council Regulation (EC) No 2062/94. |
(4) |
By virtue of Council Regulation (EC) No 1112/2005, the Administrative Board was replaced by a Governing Board. |
(5) |
The members and alternates of the said Governing Board should be appointed for a period of three years, |
HAS DECIDED AS FOLLOWS:
Article 1
The following shall be appointed members and alternates of the Governing Board of the European Agency for Safety and Health at Work for the period from 8 November 2007 to 7 November 2010:
I. GOVERNMENT REPRESENTATIVES
Country |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr Willy IMBRECHTS |
Mr Christian DENEVE |
Bulgaria |
Mr Atanas KOLCHAKOV |
Mr Petar HADJISTOJKOV |
Czech Republic |
Ms Daniela KUBÍČKOVÁ |
Ms Martina KAJÁNKOVÁ |
Denmark |
Ms Charlotte SKJOLDAGER |
Ms Tove LOFT |
Germany |
Mr Ulrich RIESE |
Mr Kai SCHÄFER |
Estonia |
— |
Ms Egle KÄÄRATS |
Ireland |
Mr Daniel KELLY |
Ms Mary DORGAN |
Greece |
Mr Trifon GINALAS |
Mr Konstantinos PETINIS |
Spain |
Mr Mario GRAU-RIOS |
Ms Pilar CASLA-BENITO |
France |
Ms Mireille JARRY |
Mr Yvan DENION |
Italy |
Ms Lea BATTISTONI |
Mr Mario ALVINO |
Cyprus |
Mr Leandros NICOLAIDES |
Mr Marios KOURTELLIS |
Latvia |
Mr Renārs LŪSIS |
Ms Jolanta KANČA |
Lithuania |
Ms Aldona SABAITIENĖ |
Ms Aušra STANKIUVIENĖ |
Luxembourg |
Mr Paul WEBER |
Mr Robert HUBERTY |
Hungary |
Mr András BÉKÉS |
Ms Mária GROSZMANN |
Malta |
Mr Mark GAUCI |
Mr Vincent ATTARD |
Netherlands |
Mr R. FERINGA |
Mr M.G. DEN HELD |
Austria |
Ms Gertrud BREINDL |
Ms Eva-Elisabeth SZYMANSKI |
Poland |
Ms Danuta KORADECKA |
Mr Daniel PODGÓRSKI |
Portugal |
— |
— |
Romania |
Ms Daniela MARINESCU |
Mr Dan Ion OPREA |
Slovenia |
Ms Tatjana PETRIČEK |
Mr Jože HAUKO |
Slovakia |
Mr Miloš JANOUŠEK |
Ms Elena PALIKOVÁ |
Finland |
Mr Mikko HURMALAINEN |
Ms Anna-Liisa SUNDQUIST |
Sweden |
Mr Bertil REMAEUS |
Ms Anna-Lena HULTGÅRD SANCINI |
United Kingdom |
Ms Elizabeth HODKINSON |
Mr Malcolm DARVILL |
II. TRADE UNION REPRESENTATIVES
Country |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr François PHILIPS |
Mr Herman FONCK |
Bulgaria |
Mr Aleksandar ZAGOROV |
Mr Ivan KOKALOV |
Czech Republic |
Mr Miroslav KOSINA |
Mr Jaroslav ZAVADIL |
Denmark |
Mr Jan KAHR FREDERIKSEN |
Ms Lone JACOBSEN |
Germany |
Ms Marina SCHROEDER |
Mr Maximilian ANGERMAIER |
Estonia |
Mr Argo SOON |
Mr Ülo KRISTJUHAN |
Ireland |
Mr Sylvester CRONIN |
Mr Fergus WHELAN |
Greece |
Mr Ioannis ADAMAKIS |
— |
Spain |
Mr Fernando RODRIGO CENCILLO |
Mr Dionis OÑA |
France |
Mr Gilles SEITZ |
Mr Henri FOREST |
Italy |
Ms Cinzia FRASCHERI |
Mr Diego ALHAIQUE |
Cyprus |
Mr Nicos ANDREOU |
Ms Maria THEOCHARIDOU |
Latvia |
Mr Ziedonis ANTAPSONS |
Mr Mārtiņš PUŽULS |
Lithuania |
— |
— |
Luxembourg |
Mr Claude FORGET |
Mr Marcel GOEREND |
Hungary |
Mr Károly GYÖRGY |
Mr Pál GERGELY |
Malta |
Mr Anthony CASARU |
Mr Salv SAMMUT |
Netherlands |
Mr Willem VAN VEELEN |
Mr Arie WOLTMEIJER |
Austria |
Ms Julia LISCHKA |
Ms Karin ZIMMERMANN |
Poland |
Ms Anita NOWAKOWSKA |
Ms Iwona PAWLACZYK |
Portugal |
Mr Armando DA COSTA FARIAS |
— |
Romania |
Mr Adrian COJOCARU |
Ms Maria GHIMPU |
Slovenia |
Ms Lučka BÖHM |
Ms Spomenka GERŽELJ |
Slovakia |
Mr Bohuslav BENDÍK |
Mr Jaroslav BOBELA |
Finland |
Ms Raili PERIMÄKI |
Mr Erkki AUVINEN |
Sweden |
Mr Sven BERGSTRÖM |
Mr Börje SJÖHOLM |
United Kingdom |
Mr Hugh ROBERTSON |
Ms Liz SNAPE |
III. REPRESENTATIVES OF EMPLOYERS' ORGANISATIONS
Country |
Members |
Alternates |
Belgium |
Mr André PELEGRIN |
Mr Ir. Kris DE MEESTER |
Bulgaria |
— |
— |
Czech Republic |
Mr Karel PETRŽELKA |
Mr Miroslav BURIŠIN |
Denmark |
Mr Thomas PHILBERT NIELSEN |
Ms Anne-Marie RØGE KRAG |
Germany |
Mr Thomas HOLTMANN |
Mr Herbert BENDER |
Estonia |
Ms Heddi LUTTERUS |
Mr Ilmar LINK |
Ireland |
Mr Tony BRISCOE |
Mr Kevin ENRIGHT |
Greece |
Mr Pavlos KYRIAKONGONAS |
Ms Natascha AVLONITOU |
Spain |
Ms Pilar IGLESIAS VALCARCE |
Mr Pere TEIXIDÓ CAMPÁS |
France |
Ms Nathalie BUET |
Mr Patrick LÉVY |
Italy |
— |
— |
Cyprus |
Mr Lefteris KARYDIS |
Ms Christina VASILA |
Latvia |
Ms Liene VANCĀNE |
— |
Lithuania |
— |
— |
Luxembourg |
Mr François ENGELS |
— |
Hungary |
Mr Géza BOMBERA |
Mr Antal SZABADKAI |
Malta |
Mr Joe DELIA |
— |
Netherlands |
Mr Bob KONING |
Mr Mario VAN MIERLO |
Austria |
Ms Christa SCHWENG |
Mr Heinrich BRAUNER |
Poland |
Mr Jacek MECINA |
— |
Portugal |
Mr Marcelino PENA E COSTA |
Mr José COSTA TAVARES |
Romania |
Mr Ovidiu NICOLESCU |
Mr Adrian IZVORANU |
Slovenia |
— |
Mr Igor ANTAUER |
Slovakia |
— |
Mr Boris MICHALÍK |
Finland |
Mr Jyrki HOLLMÉN |
Mr Rauno TOIVONEN |
Sweden |
Ms Bodil MELLBLOM |
— |
United Kingdom |
Ms Janet ASHERSON |
Mr Keith SEXTON |
Article 2
The Council will appoint the members not yet nominated at a later date.
Article 3
This Decision shall be published for information in the Official Journal of the European Union.
Done at Brussels, 8 November 2007.
For the Council
The President
R. PEREIRA
(1) OJ L 216, 20.8.1994, p. 1. Regulation as last amended by Regulation (EC) No 1112/2005 (OJ L 184, 15.7.2005, p. 5).